KS HB2260 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminating the one-sheet requirement for temporary notes for improvements.
Title
Eliminating the one-sheet requirement for temporary notes for improvements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-25 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 121 Nay: 0 (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-01 | Senate | Senate Died in Senate Committee |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Monday, March 16, 2015, 9:30 AM Room 546-S |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2015-02-25 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 121 Nay: 0 |
2015-02-24 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2015-02-18 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by |
2015-02-10 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, February 12, 2015, 3:30 PM Room 152S |
2015-02-06 | House | House Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions |
2015-02-06 | House | House Introduced |