KS HB2253 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died on Senate General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died on Senate General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Updating certain provisions of the prescription monitoring program act relating to program data, storage and access, increasing the membership of the advisory committee and providing for setup and annual maintenance fees for program data integration.
Title
Updating certain provisions of the prescription monitoring program act relating to program data, storage and access, increasing the membership of the advisory committee and providing for setup and annual maintenance fees for program data integration.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-21 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 121 Nay: 1 (Y: 121 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | Senate | Senate Died on Senate General Orders |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Public Health and Welfare |
2022-03-22 | House | House Engrossed on Tuesday, March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2022-03-21 | House | House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 121 Nay: 1 |
2022-03-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2022-03-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2022-03-15 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Social Services Budget |
2022-03-09 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, March 9, 2022, 3:30 PM Room 152-S |
2022-03-08 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, March 8, 2022, 3:30 PM Room 152-S - CANCELED |
2022-03-03 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Referred to Committee on Social Services Budget |
2021-02-05 | House | House Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-02-05 | House | House Introduced |