KS HB2238 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - House Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 15, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - House Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 15, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminating the dollar limitation for acceptance of gifts by donors to school districts or cities, or both, for library purposes.
Title
Eliminating the dollar limitation for acceptance of gifts by donors to school districts or cities, or both, for library purposes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate Consent Calendar Passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 124 Nay: 0 (Y: 124 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 124 Nay: 0 (Y: 124 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | House | House Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 15, 2021 |
2021-04-06 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, April 6, 2021 |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Senate Consent Calendar Passed Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, March 16, 2021, 9:30 AM Room 142-S |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2021-03-02 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 124 Nay: 0 |
2021-03-01 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2021-02-24 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Local Government |
2021-02-17 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, February 17, 2021, 9:00 AM Room 281-N |
2021-02-04 | House | House Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2021-02-04 | House | House Introduced |