KS HB2234 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Setting a time in which infectious disease testing of certain offenders must take place.
Title
Setting a time in which infectious disease testing of certain offenders must take place.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-20 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 124 Nay: 0 (Y: 124 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Died in Senate Committee |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Calendar, Rereferred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, March 16, 2017, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2017-02-20 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 124 Nay: 0 |
2017-02-20 | House | House Engrossed on Friday, February 17, 2017 |
2017-02-17 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2017-02-17 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2017-02-13 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary |
2017-02-07 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, February 07, 2017, 03:30 PM Room 112-N |
2017-01-31 | House | House Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-01-31 | House | House Introduced |