KS HB2221 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-01 - Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #5) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-01 - Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #5) [PDF]
Summary
Substitute HB 2221 by Committee on Government Efficiency -- Relating to the employee award program.
Title
Substitute HB 2221 by Committee on Government Efficiency -- Relating to the employee award program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-23 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 120 Nay: 4 (Y: 120 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 120 Nay: 4 (Y: 120 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 120 Nay: 4 (Y: 120 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-01 | Died in Senate Committee | |
2011-03-29 | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means | |
2011-03-28 | Received and Introduced | |
2011-05-12 | Engrossed on Wednesday, 23 March 2011 | |
2011-03-23 | Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 120 Nay: 4 | |
2011-03-22 | Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed as amended | |
2011-03-22 | Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Trimmer was adopted | |
2011-03-22 | Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Trimmer | |
2011-03-22 | Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted | |
2011-03-22 | Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed | |
2011-03-18 | Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Government Efficiency | |
2011-03-04 | Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Referred to Committee on Government Efficiency | |
2011-02-25 | Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2011-02-25 | Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar | |
2011-02-23 | Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Government Efficiency | |
2011-02-09 | Referred to Committee on Government Efficiency | |
2011-02-08 | Introduced |