KS HB2196 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Substitute for HB 2196 by Committee on Veterans and Military - Relating to the veterans benefit lottery game and disposition of net profits, creating the veterans benefit lottery game fund and transferring moneys to veterans services programs.
Title
Substitute for HB 2196 by Committee on Veterans and Military - Relating to the veterans benefit lottery game and disposition of net profits, creating the veterans benefit lottery game fund and transferring moneys to veterans services programs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | House | House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507 |
2018-02-08 | House | House Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Veterans and Military |
2017-02-07 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, February 07, 2017, 09:00 AM Room 152-S |
2017-02-07 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, February 07, 2017, 09:00 AM Room 152-S |
2017-01-27 | House | House Referred to Committee on Veterans and Military |
2017-01-27 | House | House Introduced |