KS HB2185 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-07 - Senate Withdrawn from Calendar, Rereferred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare
Pending: Senate Public Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Clarifying the naturopathic medicine scope of practice to include diagnostic imaging.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Clarifying the naturopathic medicine scope of practice to include diagnostic imaging.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-27 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 123 Nay: 1 (Y: 123 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-07SenateSenate Withdrawn from Calendar, Rereferred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare
2019-03-26SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar
2019-03-26SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2019-03-21SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Public Health and Welfare
2019-03-14SenateSenate Hearing: Thursday, March 14, 2019, 9:30 AM Room 118-N
2019-02-28SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare
2019-02-27SenateSenate Received and Introduced
2019-02-27HouseHouse Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 123 Nay: 1
2019-02-27HouseHouse Engrossed on Tuesday, February 26, 2019
2019-02-26HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2019-02-26HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2019-02-22HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Health and Human Services
2019-02-19HouseHouse Hearing: Tuesday, February 19, 2019, 1:30 PM Room 546-S
2019-02-07HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services
2019-02-07HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback