KS HB2184 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-25 - House Hearing: (opponents) Thursday, February 25, 2021, 9:00 AM Room 346-S
Pending: House Federal and State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Creating the Kansas medical marijuana regulation act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creating the Kansas medical marijuana regulation act.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-25HouseHouse Hearing: (opponents) Thursday, February 25, 2021, 9:00 AM Room 346-S
2021-02-25HouseHouse Hearing: (neutral) Thursday, February 25, 2021, 9:00 AM Room 346-S
2021-02-24HouseHouse Hearing: (proponents) Wednesday, February 24, 2021, 9:00 AM Room 346-S
2021-02-01HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs
2021-02-01HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback