KS HB2184 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-27 - Approved by Governor on Friday, 08 April 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-27 - Approved by Governor on Friday, 08 April 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Including noncommercial aviation use as a recreational purpose for the purposes of premises liability.
Title
Including noncommercial aviation use as a recreational purpose for the purposes of premises liability.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-29 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-29 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 118 Nay: 3 (Y: 118 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 118 Nay: 3 (Y: 118 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-29 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 118 Nay: 3 (Y: 118 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 118 Nay: 3 (Y: 118 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-27 | Approved by Governor on Friday, 08 April 2011 | |
2011-04-01 | Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 01, 2011 | |
2011-03-29 | Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 39 Nay: 0 | |
2011-03-29 | Committee of the Whole - Be passed | |
2011-03-28 | Withdrawn from Committee on Ways and Means and re-referred to Committee of the Whole | |
2011-03-23 | Committee of the Whole - Referred to Committee on Ways and Means | |
2011-03-09 | Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Agriculture | |
2011-02-24 | Referred to Committee on Agriculture | |
2011-02-23 | Received and Introduced | |
2011-02-23 | Final Action - Passed; Yea: 118 Nay: 3 | |
2011-02-22 | Committee of the Whole - Be passed | |
2011-02-16 | Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources | |
2011-02-08 | Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources | |
2011-02-07 | Introduced |