KS HB2177 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-05 - House Motion to accede adopted; Representative Kleeb, Representative Suellentrop and Representative Sawyer appointed as second conferees
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-05 - House Motion to accede adopted; Representative Kleeb, Representative Suellentrop and Representative Sawyer appointed as second conferees
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Senate Substitute for HB 2177 by Committee on Natural Resources - Establishing water conservation areas.
Title
Senate Substitute for HB 2177 by Committee on Natural Resources - Establishing water conservation areas.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-04 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report not adopted - Yea: 11 Nay: 25 (Y: 11 N: 25 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2015-03-25 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 123 Nay: 0 (Y: 123 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 123 Nay: 0 (Y: 123 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-05 | House | House Motion to accede adopted; Representative Kleeb, Representative Suellentrop and Representative Sawyer appointed as second conferees |
2015-06-05 | House | House Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report not adopted; Senator King, Senator Smith and Senator Pettey appointed as second conferees |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Senate Motion to reconsider - Adopted |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report not adopted; Yea: 11 Nay: 25 |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Senate Conference committee report now available |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Senate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Senate Senator Pettey replaces Senator Francisco on the Conference Committee |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Senate Senator Smith replaces Senator Kerschen on the Conference Committee |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Senate Senator King replaces Senator Powell on the Conference Committee |
2015-04-30 | House | House Representative Carmichael replaces Representative Victors on the Conference Committee |
2015-04-30 | House | House Representative Macheers replaces Representative Boldra on the Conference Committee |
2015-04-30 | House | House Representative Barker replaces Representative Schwartz on the Conference Committee |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Powell, Senator Kerschen and Senator Francisco appointed as conferees |
2015-04-01 | House | House Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Schwartz , Representative Boldra and Representative Victors as conferees |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 39 Nay: 0 |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Natural Resources |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 11, 2015, 8:30 AM Room 159-S |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Natural Resources |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2015-02-26 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 123 Nay: 0 |
2015-02-26 | House | House Engrossed on Wednesday, February 25 , 2015 |
2015-02-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2015-02-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2015-02-18 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Local Government |
2015-02-10 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, February 10, 2015, 1:30 PM Room 281N |
2015-01-29 | House | House Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2015-01-29 | House | House Introduced |