KS HB2175 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibit use of carbon monoxide chambers for euthanizing dogs and cats.
Title
Prohibit use of carbon monoxide chambers for euthanizing dogs and cats.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-01 | House | House Died in Committee |
2015-03-06 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, March 10, 2015, 3:30 PM Room 346-S |
2015-01-29 | House | House Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2015-01-29 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2015_16/measures/hb2175/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2015_16/measures/documents/hb2175_00_0000.pdf |