KS HB2173 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Senate Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing a commercial industrial hemp program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a commercial industrial hemp program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-26 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 119 Nay: 5 (Y: 119 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources
2019-03-26SenateSenate Received and Introduced
2019-03-26HouseHouse Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 119 Nay: 5
2019-03-26HouseHouse Engrossed on Monday, March 25, 2019
2019-03-25HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2019-03-25HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Dove was rejected
2019-03-25HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Dove
2019-03-25HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Dove was withdrawn
2019-03-25HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Dove
2019-03-25HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2019-03-20HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Agriculture
2019-03-06HouseHouse Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Rereferred to Committee on Agriculture
2019-02-27HouseHouse Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Appropriations
2019-02-26HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar
2019-02-22HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Agriculture
2019-02-14HouseHouse Hearing continuation: Thursday, February 14, 2019, 3:30 PM Room 582-N - CANCELLED
2019-02-13HouseHouse Hearing: Wednesday, February 13, 2019, 3:30 PM Room 582-N
2019-02-07HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Agriculture
2019-02-07HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback