KS HB2172 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-24 - House Approved by Governor on Wednesday, April 19, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-24 - House Approved by Governor on Wednesday, April 19, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Enacting the uniform trust decanting act, authorizing modification of a noncharitable irrevocable trust to provide that the rule against perpetuities is inapplicable, providing that the Kansas uniform statutory rule against perpetuities is inapplicable to trusts under certain circumstances and modifying the definition of resident trust in the Kansas income tax act.
Title
Enacting the uniform trust decanting act, authorizing modification of a noncharitable irrevocable trust to provide that the rule against perpetuities is inapplicable, providing that the Kansas uniform statutory rule against perpetuities is inapplicable to trusts under certain circumstances and modifying the definition of resident trust in the Kansas income tax act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-05 - House - House Concurred with amendments in conference - Yea: 123 Nay: 0 (Y: 123 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 36 Nay: 4 (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 122 Nay: 0 (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 36 Nay: 4 (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 122 Nay: 0 (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-24 | House | House Approved by Governor on Wednesday, April 19, 2023 |
2023-04-24 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 14, 2023 |
2023-04-05 | House | House Concurred with amendments in conference; Yea: 123 Nay: 0 |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Warren, Senator Wilborn and Senator Corson appointed as conferees |
2023-04-03 | House | House Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Patton , Representative Schreiber and Representative Carmichael as conferees |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 36 Nay: 4 |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Monday, March 13, 2023, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2023-02-23 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 122 Nay: 0 |
2023-02-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2023-02-13 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary |
2023-01-31 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, January 31, 2023, 3:30 PM Room 582-N |
2023-01-25 | House | House Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2023-01-25 | House | House Introduced |