KS HB2168 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 27 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-04-27 - House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, March 24, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Increasing the rate and expanding the base of the hospital provider assessment and extending the quality care assessment imposed on skilled nursing care facilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increasing the rate and expanding the base of the hospital provider assessment and extending the quality care assessment imposed on skilled nursing care facilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-19 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 91 Nay: 24 (Y: 91 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2020-03-19 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 33 Nay: 6 (Y: 33 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 122 Nay: 1 (Y: 122 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-27HouseHouse Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, March 24, 2020
2020-03-19HouseHouse Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 91 Nay: 24
2020-03-19SenateSenate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 33 Nay: 6
2020-03-19SenateSenate Conference committee report now available
2020-03-17SenateSenate Senator McGinn, Senator Billinger, and Senator Hawk are appointed to replace Senator Baumgardner, Senator Alley, and Senator Sykes on the Conference Committee
2019-04-02SenateSenate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Baumgardner, Senator Alley and Senator Sykes appointed as conferees
2019-04-02HouseHouse Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Waymaster , Representative Hoffman and Representative Wolfe Moore as conferees
2019-03-27SenateSenate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 39 Nay: 0
2019-03-26SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2019-03-26SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2019-03-22SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Education
2019-03-13SenateSenate Hearing: Wednesday, March 13, 2019, 1:30 PM Room 144-S
2019-02-28SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Education
2019-02-27SenateSenate Received and Introduced
2019-02-27HouseHouse Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 122 Nay: 1
2019-02-27HouseHouse Engrossed on Tuesday, February 26, 2019
2019-02-26HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2019-02-26HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2019-02-22HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Appropriations
2019-02-18HouseHouse Hearing: Monday, February 18, 2019, 9:00 AM Room 112-N
2019-02-06HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Appropriations
2019-02-06HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback