KS HB2165 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - House Approved by Governor on Friday, April 16, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - House Approved by Governor on Friday, April 16, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for all vehicles more than 35 years old to qualify as an antique vehicle.
Title
Providing for all vehicles more than 35 years old to qualify as an antique vehicle.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-07 - House - House Concurred with amendments - Yea: 117 Nay: 5 (Y: 117 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 114 Nay: 9 (Y: 114 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 114 Nay: 9 (Y: 114 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | House | House Approved by Governor on Friday, April 16, 2021 |
2021-04-09 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 9, 2021 |
2021-04-08 | House | House Reengrossed on Wednesday, April 7, 2021 |
2021-04-07 | House | House Concurred with amendments; Yea: 117 Nay: 5 |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Transportation |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, March 18, 2021, 8:30 AM Room 546-S |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2021-02-12 | House | House Engrossed on Thursday, February 11, 2021 |
2021-02-11 | House | House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 114 Nay: 9 |
2021-02-11 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2021-02-11 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2021-02-08 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Transportation |
2021-02-03 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, February 3, 2021, 1:30 PM Room 582-N |
2021-01-28 | House | House Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2021-01-28 | House | House Introduced |