KS HB2160 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-04 - House Conference Committee Report agree to disagree adopted; Representative Johnson, Representative Mason and Representative Gartner appointed as second conferees
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Providing sales tax authority for Dickinson, Jackson, Russell, Thomas and Wabaunsee counties, and providing a sales tax exemption for sales of certain coins or bullion.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing sales tax authority for Dickinson, Jackson, Russell, Thomas and Wabaunsee counties, and providing a sales tax exemption for sales of certain coins or bullion.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 112 Nay: 7 (Y: 112 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-04HouseHouse Conference Committee Report agree to disagree adopted; Representative Johnson, Representative Mason and Representative Gartner appointed as second conferees
2019-05-04HouseHouse Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
2019-05-04SenateSenate Conference Committee Report agree to disagree adopted; Senator Tyson, Senator Kerschen and Senator Holland appointed as second conferees
2019-05-04SenateSenate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
2019-04-04SenateSenate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Tyson, Senator Kerschen and Senator Holland appointed as conferees
2019-04-04HouseHouse Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Johnson , Representative Mason and Representative Gartner as conferees
2019-03-27SenateSenate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 39 Nay: 0
2019-03-26SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2019-03-26SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2019-03-21SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Assessment and Taxation
2019-03-19SenateSenate Hearing: Tuesday, March 19, 2019, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
2019-03-11SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation
2019-03-08SenateSenate Received and Introduced
2019-03-08HouseHouse Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 112 Nay: 7
2019-03-08HouseHouse Engrossed on Thursday, March 7, 2019
2019-03-07HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2019-03-07HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2019-02-26HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Taxation
2019-02-13HouseHouse Hearing: Wednesday, February 13, 2019, 3:30 PM Room 112-N
2019-02-06HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Taxation
2019-02-06HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback