KS HB2148 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing a sales tax exemption for purchases by gage park memorial, inc.
Title
Providing a sales tax exemption for purchases by gage park memorial, inc.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | House | House Died in Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, February 8, 2022, 3:30 PM Room 346-S |
2022-02-02 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, February 2, 2022, 3:30 PM Room 346-S - CANCELED |
2021-01-27 | House | House Referred to Committee on Taxation |
2021-01-27 | House | House Introduced |