KS HB2146 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-05 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-05 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding the number of presumptive probation and border grid blocks in the sentencing grid for drug crimes.
Title
Expanding the number of presumptive probation and border grid blocks in the sentencing grid for drug crimes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-05 | House | House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507 |
2021-02-25 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2021-02-10 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, February 10, 2021, 1:30 PM Room 546-S |
2021-01-27 | House | House Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2021-01-27 | House | House Introduced |