KS HB2142 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creating the get the lead out of school drinking water act to require schools to comply with legal limits on lead content in school drinking water.
Title
Creating the get the lead out of school drinking water act to require schools to comply with legal limits on lead content in school drinking water.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | House | House Died in Committee |
2023-02-14 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, February 14, 2023, 1:30 PM Room 218-N |
2023-01-24 | House | House Referred to Committee on Education |
2023-01-24 | House | House Introduced |