KS HB2142 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a unified school district employee health care benefits program.
Title
Establishing a unified school district employee health care benefits program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | House | House Died in Committee |
2017-02-15 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Rereferred to Committee on K-12 Education Budget |
2017-02-14 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on K-12 Education Budget; Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2017-02-13 | House | House Hearing: Monday, February 13, 2017, 01:30 PM Room 346-S - CANCELLED |
2017-01-25 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Education; Referred to Committee on K-12 Education Budget |
2017-01-24 | House | House Referred to Committee on Education |
2017-01-24 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/hb2142/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/hb2142_00_0000.pdf |