KS HB2130 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-01 - Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-01 - Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
Labor organizations; political activity.
Title
Labor organizations; political activity.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-24 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 75 Nay: 46 (Y: 75 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Be passed - Yea: 80 Nay: 36 (Y: 80 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 75 Nay: 46 (Y: 75 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
House - House Committee of the Whole - Be passed - Yea: 80 Nay: 36 (Y: 80 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Be passed - Yea: 80 Nay: 36 (Y: 80 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 75 Nay: 46 (Y: 75 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
House - House Committee of the Whole - Be passed - Yea: 80 Nay: 36 (Y: 80 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-01 | Died in Senate Committee | |
2011-03-15 | Now in Committee on Ethics and Elections | |
2011-03-15 | Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Commerce and Committee on Ethics and Elections | |
2011-03-08 | Withdrawn from Committee on Ethics and Elections; Referred Separately to Committee on Commerce and Committee on Ethics and Elections | |
2011-02-25 | Referred to Committee on Ethics and Elections | |
2011-02-24 | Received and Introduced | |
2011-02-24 | Final Action - Passed; Yea: 75 Nay: 46 | |
2011-02-23 | Committee of the Whole - Be passed Yea: 80 Nay: 36 | |
2011-02-23 | Committee of the Whole - Rereferred to Committee on Commerce and Economic Development | |
2011-02-18 | Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Commerce and Economic Development | |
2011-02-03 | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Economic Development | |
2011-01-31 | Introduced |