KS HB2120 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-04 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-04 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Board of nursing reinstatement of revoked licenses and reinstatement fee.
Title
Board of nursing reinstatement of revoked licenses and reinstatement fee.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-04 | House | House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507 |
2015-02-12 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Health and Human Services |
2015-02-03 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, February 04, 2015, 1:30 PM Room 546S |
2015-01-23 | House | House Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2015-01-23 | House | House Introduced |