KS HB2120 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Vetoed on May 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-01 - House No motion to reconsider vetoed bill; Veto sustained
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-01 - House No motion to reconsider vetoed bill; Veto sustained
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Updating provisions relating to the Kansas bureau of investigations DNA database.
Title
Updating provisions relating to the Kansas bureau of investigations DNA database.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-09 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 74 Nay: 49 (Y: 74 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-04 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-01 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 121 Nay: 2 (Y: 121 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-04 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-01 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 121 Nay: 2 (Y: 121 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-01 | House | House No motion to reconsider vetoed bill; Veto sustained |
2013-05-24 | House | House Vetoed by Governor; Returned to House on Thursday, May 23, 2013 |
2013-05-17 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, May 17, 2013 |
2013-05-15 | House | House Engrossed on Friday, 10 May 2013 |
2013-05-09 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 74 Nay: 49 |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Senate Conference committee report now available |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator King, Senator Smith and Senator Haley appointed as conferees |
2013-03-25 | House | House Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Rubin , Representative Gonzalez and Representative Finney as conferees |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Monday, March 11, 2013, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2013-03-01 | House | House Engrossed on Friday, 01 March 2013 |
2013-03-01 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 121 Nay: 2 |
2013-02-28 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2013-02-28 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2013-02-26 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by |
2013-02-01 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, February 07, 2013, 1:30 PM Room 152 S |
2013-01-29 | House | House Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2013-01-29 | House | House Introduced |