KS HB2112 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-30 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-30 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Campaign finance; transfer of campaign money to another candidacy.
Title
Campaign finance; transfer of campaign money to another candidacy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-28 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 95 Nay: 29 (Y: 95 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-30 | Senate | Senate Died in Senate Committee |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, January 30, 2014, 9:30 AM Room 159-S |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Ethics and Elections |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2013-02-28 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 95 Nay: 29 |
2013-02-28 | House | House Engrossed on Wednesday, 27 February 2013 |
2013-02-27 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2013-02-27 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Ward was rejected |
2013-02-27 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Ward |
2013-02-27 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2013-02-14 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by |
2013-01-30 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, January 30, 2013, 1:30 PM Room 281-N |
2013-01-28 | House | House Referred to Committee on Elections |
2013-01-28 | House | House Introduced |