KS HB2107 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-08 - House Approved by Governor on Tuesday, 16 April 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-08 - House Approved by Governor on Tuesday, 16 April 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Insurance; enacting the electronic notice and document act; allows insurer to return premiums to a policyholder separate from the notice of an adverse underwriting decision.
Title
Insurance; enacting the electronic notice and document act; allows insurer to return premiums to a policyholder separate from the notice of an adverse underwriting decision.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-05 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 69 Nay: 50 (Y: 69 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-04-05 - House - House Conference Committee Report not adopted; Representative Shultz, Representative Hermanson and Representative Finney appointed as second conferees - Yea: 68 Nay: 51 (Y: 68 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-04-04 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-01 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 121 Nay: 0 (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-05 - House - House Conference Committee Report not adopted; Representative Shultz, Representative Hermanson and Representative Finney appointed as second conferees - Yea: 68 Nay: 51 (Y: 68 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-04-04 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-01 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 121 Nay: 0 (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-08 | House | House Approved by Governor on Tuesday, 16 April 2013 |
2013-05-08 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 12, 2013 |
2013-04-05 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 69 Nay: 50 |
2013-04-05 | House | House Motion to Reconsider Adopted |
2013-04-05 | House | House Conference Committee Report not adopted; Representative Shultz, Representative Hermanson and Representative Finney appointed as second conferees Yea: 68 Nay: 51 |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Senate Conference committee report now available |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Olson, Senator Longbine and Senator Hawk appointed as conferees |
2013-03-26 | House | House Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Shultz , Representative Hermanson and Representative Finney as conferees |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 13, 2013, 9:30 AM Room 546-S |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2013-03-06 | House | House Engrossed on Friday, 01 March 2013 |
2013-03-01 | House | House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 121 Nay: 0 |
2013-03-01 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2013-03-01 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2013-03-01 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2013-02-26 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by |
2013-02-13 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, February 20, 2013, 3:30 PM Room 152-S |
2013-02-06 | House | House Hearing: Monday, February 11, 2013, 3:30 PM Room 152-S -CANCELLED |
2013-01-28 | House | House Referred to Committee on Insurance |
2013-01-28 | House | House Introduced |