KS HB2101 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - House Approved by Governor on Wednesday, April 10, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - House Approved by Governor on Wednesday, April 10, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Updating state credit union statutes.
Title
Updating state credit union statutes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 116 Nay: 1 (Y: 116 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 116 Nay: 1 (Y: 116 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | House | House Approved by Governor on Wednesday, April 10, 2019 |
2019-04-02 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, April 2, 2019 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed; Yea: 39 Nay: 0 |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, March 14, 2019, 9:30 AM Room 546-S |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2019-02-22 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 116 Nay: 1 |
2019-02-22 | House | House Engrossed on Thursday, February 21, 2019 |
2019-02-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2019-02-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2019-02-18 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Financial Institutions and Pensions |
2019-02-07 | House | House Hearing: Monday, February 11, 2019, 9:00 AM Room 281-N |
2019-01-29 | House | House Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Pensions |
2019-01-29 | House | House Introduced |