KS HB2096 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-03 - House Approved by Governor on Tuesday, 02 April 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-03 - House Approved by Governor on Tuesday, 02 April 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Local governmental entities and investment of public moneys.
Title
Local governmental entities and investment of public moneys.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-20 - Senate - Senate Consent Calendar Passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 123 Nay: 0 (Y: 123 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 123 Nay: 0 (Y: 123 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-03 | House | House Approved by Governor on Tuesday, 02 April 2013 |
2013-03-26 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, March 26, 2013 |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Senate Consent Calendar Passed Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, March 12, 2013, 9:30 AM Room 546-S |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2013-02-14 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 123 Nay: 0 |
2013-02-13 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2013-02-11 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by |
2013-01-25 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, January 31, 2013, 3:30 PM Room 152-S |
2013-01-24 | House | House Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions |
2013-01-24 | House | House Introduced |