KS HB2094 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died on Senate General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died on Senate General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Substitute for HB 2094 by Committee on Appropriations - Expanding educational benefits of tuition and fees waiver for spouses and dependents of public safety officers and personnel who are injured or disabled while performing service-related duties.
Title
Substitute for HB 2094 by Committee on Appropriations - Expanding educational benefits of tuition and fees waiver for spouses and dependents of public safety officers and personnel who are injured or disabled while performing service-related duties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-17 - House - House Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 117 Nay: 6 (Y: 117 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | Senate | Senate Died on Senate General Orders |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Ways and Means |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, March 25, 2021, 10:30 AM Room 548-S |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2021-03-17 | House | House Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 117 Nay: 6 |
2021-03-16 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed |
2021-03-16 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed |
2021-02-25 | House | House Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Appropriations |
2021-01-28 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, January 28, 2021, 9:00 AM Room 112-N |
2021-01-21 | House | House Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-01-21 | House | House Introduced |