KS HB2094 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-26 - House Approved by Governor on Tuesday, June 16 , 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-26 - House Approved by Governor on Tuesday, June 16 , 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Senate Substitute for HB 2094 by Committee on Transportation - Relating to size limitations of forage cutter and custom harvester, use of safety belts and establishing the seat belt safety fund.
Title
Senate Substitute for HB 2094 by Committee on Transportation - Relating to size limitations of forage cutter and custom harvester, use of safety belts and establishing the seat belt safety fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-11 - House - House Concurred with amendments - Yea: 103 Nay: 0 (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2015-06-10 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed as amended - Yea: 33 Nay: 0 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 122 Nay: 0 (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-06-10 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed as amended - Yea: 33 Nay: 0 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 122 Nay: 0 (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-26 | House | House Approved by Governor on Tuesday, June 16 , 2015 |
2015-06-26 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, June 16, 2015 |
2015-06-11 | House | House Engrossed on Thursday, June 11 , 2015 |
2015-06-11 | House | House Concurred with amendments; Yea: 103 Nay: 0 |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed as amended; Yea: 33 Nay: 0 |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed as amended |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Bruce was adopted |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Bruce |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Senate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2015-06-10 | House | House Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Committee on Ways and Means and referred to Committee of the Whole |
2015-06-08 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Transportation |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, March 10, 2015, 8:30 AM Room 546-S |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2015-02-19 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 122 Nay: 0 |
2015-02-18 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2015-02-12 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by |
2015-02-03 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, February 05, 2015, 1:30 PM Room 582N |
2015-01-27 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, January 28, 2015, 1:30 PM Room 582N |
2015-01-23 | House | House Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2015-01-23 | House | House Introduced |