KS HB2059 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing reciprocity for licenses to carry concealed handguns and creating two classes of concealed carry licenses.
Title
Providing reciprocity for licenses to carry concealed handguns and creating two classes of concealed carry licenses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | House | House Died in Committee |
2021-01-27 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, January 27, 2021, 9:00 AM Room 346-S |
2021-01-13 | House | House Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2021-01-13 | House | House Introduced |