KS HB2049 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-28 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-28 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing felony loss thresholds for certain property crimes.
Title
Increasing felony loss thresholds for certain property crimes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-28 | House | House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507 |
2019-02-05 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2019-01-28 | House | House Hearing: Monday, January 28, 2019, 1:30 PM Room 152-S |
2019-01-22 | House | House Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2019-01-22 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/hb2049/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/hb2049_00_0000.pdf |