KS HB2041 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-15 - House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Taxation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-15 - House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Taxation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing a sales tax exemption for purchases by a not-for-profit corporation operating a community theater.
Title
Providing a sales tax exemption for purchases by a not-for-profit corporation operating a community theater.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-15 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Taxation |
2023-01-26 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, January 26, 2023, 3:30 PM Room 346-S |
2023-01-17 | House | House Referred to Committee on Taxation |
2023-01-17 | House | House Introduced |