KS HB2038 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting certain veterans and current members of the armed forces from paying certain business filing fees.
Title
Exempting certain veterans and current members of the armed forces from paying certain business filing fees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | House | House Died in Committee |
2017-02-03 | House | House On motion of Majority Leader Hineman, the bill was withdrawn from Final Action and Referred to the Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development in accordance with House Rule 2306. |
2017-02-02 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2017-02-02 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Seiwert was withdrawn |
2017-02-02 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Seiwert |
2017-01-25 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development |
2017-01-23 | House | House Hearing: Monday, January 23, 2017, 01:30 PM Room 112-N |
2017-01-11 | House | House Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development |
2017-01-11 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/hb2038/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/hb2038_00_0000.pdf |