KS HB2036 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 119 Nay: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Senate Substitute for HB 2036 by Committee on Assessment and Taxation - Providing a sales tax exemption for certain purchases by disabled veterans.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Senate Substitute for HB 2036 by Committee on Assessment and Taxation - Providing a sales tax exemption for certain purchases by disabled veterans.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-04-05 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 119 Nay: 0 (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-04-05 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 24 Nay: 9 (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 38 Nay: 1 (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 38 Nay: 2 (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 123 Nay: 1 (Y: 123 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-05HouseHouse Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 119 Nay: 0
2024-04-05SenateSenate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 24 Nay: 9
2024-04-05SenateSenate Conference committee report now available
2024-04-05HouseHouse Conference Committee Report agree to disagree adopted; Representative Smith, A., Representative Bergkamp and Representative Sawyer appointed as third conferees
2024-04-05SenateSenate Conference Committee Report agree to disagree adopted; Senator Tyson, Senator Peck and Senator Holland appointed as third conferees
2024-04-05SenateSenate Conference committee report now available
2024-04-05SenateSenate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Tyson, Senator Peck and Senator Holland appointed as second conferees
2024-04-04HouseHouse Conference Committee Report not adopted; Representative Smith, A., Representative Bergkamp and Representative Sawyer appointed as second conferees
2024-04-04SenateSenate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 38 Nay: 1
2024-04-04SenateSenate Conference committee report now available
2024-03-27SenateSenate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Tyson, Senator Peck and Senator Holland appointed as conferees
2024-03-25HouseHouse Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Smith, A. , Representative Bergkamp and Representative Sawyer as conferees
2024-03-14SenateSenate Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 38 Nay: 2
2024-03-14SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed
2024-03-14SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
2024-03-12SenateSenate Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Assessment and Taxation
2024-01-23SenateSenate Hearing continuation: Tuesday, January 23, 2024, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
2024-01-17SenateSenate Hearing: (opponents) Wednesday, January 17, 2024, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
2024-01-17SenateSenate Hearing: Wednesday, January 17, 2024, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
2024-01-16SenateSenate Hearing: (proponents) Tuesday, January 16, 2024, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
2023-04-04SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation
2023-04-03HouseHouse Engrossed on Thursday, March 30, 2023
2023-04-03SenateSenate Received and Introduced
2023-03-29HouseHouse Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 123 Nay: 1
2023-03-28HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2023-03-28HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Proctor was adopted
2023-03-28HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Proctor
2023-02-16HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Taxation
2023-01-30HouseHouse Hearing: Monday, January 30, 2023, 3:30 PM Room 346-S
2023-01-17HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Taxation
2023-01-17HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://kslegislature.org/li/b2023_24/measures/hb2036/
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2023_24/measures/documents/hb2036_00_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2023_24/measures/documents/hb2036_01_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2023_24/measures/documents/hb2036_02_0000.pdf
Amendmenthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2023_24/measures/documents/cr_2023_hb2036_h_1235.pdf
Amendmenthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2023_24/measures/documents/fa_2023_hb2036_h_1637.pdf
Amendmenthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2023_24/measures/documents/cr_2024_hb2036_s_3469.pdf
Amendmenthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2023_24/measures/documents/ccr_2024_hb2036_s_3933.pdf
Amendmenthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2023_24/measures/documents/ccr_2024_hb2036_s_3978.pdf
Amendmenthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2023_24/measures/documents/ccr_2024_hb2036_s_3977.pdf
Supplementhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2023_24/measures/documents/fisc_note_hb2036_00_0000.pdf
Supplementhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2023_24/measures/documents/supp_note_hb2036_00_0000.pdf
Supplementhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2023_24/measures/documents/supp_note_hb2036_01_0000.pdf
Supplementhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2023_24/measures/documents/supp_note_hb2036_02_0000.pdf
Supplementhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2023_24/measures/documents/ccrb_hb2036_01_040324noon.pdf
Supplementhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2023_24/measures/documents/ccrb_hb2036_03_04052024.pdf
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2023_24/measures/vote_view/je_20230329102630_816593/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2023_24/measures/vote_view/je_20240314224024_527406/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2023_24/measures/vote_view/je_20240404152249_863542/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2023_24/measures/vote_view/je_20240406005529_283298/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2023_24/measures/vote_view/je_20240406023605_397539/

Bill Comments

feedback