KS HB2034 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-28 - Withdrawn from Committee on Ways and Means; Rereferred to Committee on Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-28 - Withdrawn from Committee on Ways and Means; Rereferred to Committee on Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
Raising speed limit on certain roadways to 75 mph; violations.
Title
Raising speed limit on certain roadways to 75 mph; violations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-25 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 95 Nay: 23 (Y: 95 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 95 Nay: 23 (Y: 95 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 95 Nay: 23 (Y: 95 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-28 | Withdrawn from Committee on Ways and Means; Rereferred to Committee on Transportation | |
2011-03-23 | Withdrawn from Committee on Transportation; Referred to Committee on Ways and Means | |
2011-03-03 | Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2011-03-02 | Received and Introduced | |
2011-05-12 | Engrossed on Friday, 25 February 2011 | |
2011-02-25 | Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 95 Nay: 23 | |
2011-02-24 | Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended | |
2011-02-24 | Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Knox was adopted | |
2011-02-24 | Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Knox | |
2011-02-24 | Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Knox was rejected | |
2011-02-24 | Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Knox | |
2011-02-23 | Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar | |
2011-02-18 | Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Transportation | |
2011-01-20 | Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2011-01-19 | Introduced |