KS HB2026 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - House Approved by Governor on Monday, April 24, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - House Approved by Governor on Monday, April 24, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Senate Substitute for HB 2026 by Committee on Public Health and Welfare - KanCare process and contract requirements.
Title
Senate Substitute for HB 2026 by Committee on Public Health and Welfare - KanCare process and contract requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-06 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 119 Nay: 5 (Y: 119 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 37 Nay: 3 (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 34 Nay: 5 (Y: 34 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 106 Nay: 14 (Y: 106 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 37 Nay: 3 (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 34 Nay: 5 (Y: 34 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 106 Nay: 14 (Y: 106 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | House | House Approved by Governor on Monday, April 24, 2017 |
2017-05-01 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 14, 2017 |
2017-04-06 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 119 Nay: 5 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 37 Nay: 3 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Senate Conference committee report now available |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator V. Schmidt, Senator Bollier and Senator Kelly appointed as conferees |
2017-03-29 | House | House Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Hawkins , Representative Concannon and Representative Wilson as conferees |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 34 Nay: 5 |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Public Health and Welfare |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 08, 2017, 09:30 AM Room 118-N |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2017-01-26 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 106 Nay: 14 |
2017-01-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2017-01-19 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Health and Human Services |
2017-01-17 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, January 17, 2017, 01:30 PM Room 546-S |
2017-01-11 | House | House Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2017-01-11 | House | House Introduced |