KS HB2015 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing distinctive license plates for current and veteran members of the United States army, navy, marine corps, air force and coast guard.
Title
Providing distinctive license plates for current and veteran members of the United States army, navy, marine corps, air force and coast guard.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | House | House Died in Committee |
2021-02-09 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, February 9, 2021, 1:30 PM Room 582-N |
2021-01-11 | House | House Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2021-01-11 | House | House Introduced |
2021-01-11 | House | House Prefiled for Introduction on Tuesday, December 22, 2020 |