KS HB2014 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-24 - House Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 20, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-24 - House Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 20, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designating a portion of United States highway 69 in Crawford county as the Robert Lessen memorial highway.
Title
Designating a portion of United States highway 69 in Crawford county as the Robert Lessen memorial highway.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-06 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 122 Nay: 1 (Y: 122 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 36 Nay: 0 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 118 Nay: 0 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 36 Nay: 0 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 118 Nay: 0 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-24 | House | House Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 20, 2023 |
2023-04-24 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 14, 2023 |
2023-04-06 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 122 Nay: 1 |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Senate Conference committee report now available |
2023-04-05 | House | House Representative Carpenter, W., Representative Kessler, and Representative Hoye are appointed to replace Representative Francis, Representative Neelly, and Representative Ballard on the Conference Committee |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Senate Senator Thompson and Senator Faust-Goudeau are appointed to replace Senator Petersen and Senator Corson on the Conference Committee |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Petersen, Senator Kloos and Senator Corson appointed as conferees |
2023-03-28 | House | House Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Francis , Representative Neelly and Representative Ballard as conferees |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 36 Nay: 0 |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Transportation |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 8, 2023, 8:30 AM Room 546-S |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2023-02-09 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 118 Nay: 0 |
2023-02-08 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2023-02-07 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Transportation |
2023-02-02 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, February 2, 2023, 1:30 PM Room 582-N |
2023-01-11 | House | House Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2023-01-11 | House | House Introduced |