KS HB2010 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-26 - House Approved by Governor on Tuesday, June 16 , 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-26 - House Approved by Governor on Tuesday, June 16 , 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Conducting information technology audits.
Title
Conducting information technology audits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-10 - House - House Concurred with amendments in conference - Yea: 111 Nay: 0 (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 38 Nay: 0 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 115 Nay: 0 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 38 Nay: 0 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 115 Nay: 0 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-26 | House | House Approved by Governor on Tuesday, June 16 , 2015 |
2015-06-26 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, June 16, 2015 |
2015-06-11 | House | House Reengrossed on Thursday, June 11 , 2015 |
2015-06-10 | House | House Concurred with amendments in conference; Yea: 111 Nay: 0 |
2015-06-10 | House | House Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Masterson, Senator Denning and Senator Kelly appointed as conferees |
2015-03-23 | House | House Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Ryckman , Representative Schwartz and Representative Henry as conferees |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 38 Nay: 0 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Ways and Means |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, March 05, 2015, 10:30 AM Room 548-S |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2015-02-13 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 115 Nay: 0 |
2015-02-13 | House | House Engrossed on Friday, February 13 , 2015 |
2015-02-12 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2015-02-12 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Hoffman was adopted |
2015-02-12 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Hoffman |
2015-02-12 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2015-01-27 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Appropriations |
2015-01-23 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, January 27, 2015, 9:00 AM Room 112N |
2015-01-12 | House | House Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2015-01-12 | House | House Introduced |
2015-01-12 | House | House Prefiled for Introduction on Tuesday, December 30, 2014 |