KS HB2010 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-01 - Approved by Governor on Thursday, 19 May 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-01 - Approved by Governor on Thursday, 19 May 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Offenses and conduct giving rise to forfeiture.
Title
Offenses and conduct giving rise to forfeiture.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-06 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 111 Nay: 5 (Y: 111 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-05-06 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 111 Nay: 5 (Y: 111 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 37 Nay: 0 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 37 Nay: 0 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 121 Nay: 0 (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 121 Nay: 0 (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-05-06 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 111 Nay: 5 (Y: 111 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 37 Nay: 0 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 37 Nay: 0 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 121 Nay: 0 (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 121 Nay: 0 (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-01 | Approved by Governor on Thursday, 19 May 2011 | |
2011-06-01 | Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, May 13, 2011 | |
2011-05-10 | Engrossed on Monday, 09 May 2011 | |
2011-05-06 | Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 111 Nay: 5 | |
2011-05-06 | Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; | |
2011-05-05 | Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 37 Nay: 0 | |
2011-05-05 | Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; | |
2011-05-05 | Conference committee report now available | |
2011-03-29 | Motion to accede adopted; Senator Owens, Senator King and Senator Haley appointed as 1 conferees | |
2011-03-28 | Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Kinzer , Representative Patton and Representative Pauls as conferees | |
2011-03-23 | Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 39 Nay: 0 | |
2011-03-22 | Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended | |
2011-03-22 | Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Owens was adopted | |
2011-03-22 | Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Owens | |
2011-03-22 | Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Owens was adopted | |
2011-03-22 | Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Owens | |
2011-03-21 | Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-02-24 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-02-23 | Received and Introduced | |
2011-02-23 | Final Action - Passed; Yea: 121 Nay: 0 | |
2011-02-22 | Committee of the Whole - Be passed | |
2011-02-16 | Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-01-14 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-01-13 | Introduced |