KS HB2008 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-27 - Approved by Governor on Friday, 08 April 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-27 - Approved by Governor on Friday, 08 April 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Senate Substitute for HB 2008 by Committee on Judicary -- Creating a special sentencing rule for identity theft and identity fraud.
Title
Senate Substitute for HB 2008 by Committee on Judicary -- Creating a special sentencing rule for identity theft and identity fraud.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-30 - House - House Concurred with amendments in conference - Yea: 120 Nay: 0 (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - House - House Concurred with amendments in conference - Yea: 120 Nay: 0 (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 118 Nay: 2 (Y: 118 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 118 Nay: 2 (Y: 118 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - House - House Concurred with amendments in conference - Yea: 120 Nay: 0 (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 118 Nay: 2 (Y: 118 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 118 Nay: 2 (Y: 118 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-27 | Approved by Governor on Friday, 08 April 2011 | |
2011-04-01 | Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 01, 2011 | |
2011-05-12 | Reengrossed on Thursday, 31 March 2011 | |
2011-03-30 | Concurred with amendments in conference; Yea: 120 Nay: 0 | |
2011-03-29 | Motion to accede adopted; Senator Owens, Senator King and Senator Haley appointed as 1 conferees | |
2011-03-28 | Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Colloton , Representative Kinzer and Representative McCray-Miller as conferees | |
2011-03-23 | Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 39 Nay: 0 | |
2011-03-22 | Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed | |
2011-03-22 | Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed | |
2011-03-21 | Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-02-15 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-02-14 | Received and Introduced | |
2011-05-11 | Engrossed on Monday, 14 February 2011 | |
2011-02-14 | Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 118 Nay: 2 | |
2011-02-11 | Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended | |
2011-02-11 | Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted | |
2011-02-09 | Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice | |
2011-01-14 | Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice | |
2011-01-13 | Introduced |