KS HB2001 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - House Approved by Governor on Thursday, March 14, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - House Approved by Governor on Thursday, March 14, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Amending the sunset and assessment rates for the remediation reimbursement program.
Title
Amending the sunset and assessment rates for the remediation reimbursement program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 119 Nay: 0 (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 119 Nay: 0 (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | House | House Approved by Governor on Thursday, March 14, 2019 |
2019-03-08 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, March 8, 2019 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, February 20, 2019, 8:30 AM Room 159-S |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2019-02-07 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 119 Nay: 0 |
2019-02-06 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2019-01-31 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Agriculture |
2019-01-23 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, January 23, 2019, 3:30 PM Room 582-N |
2019-01-14 | House | House Referred to Committee on Agriculture |
2019-01-14 | House | House Introduced |
2019-01-14 | House | House Prefiled for Introduction on Thursday, December 6, 2018 |