KS H2654 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in committee
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in committee
Summary
Elections: Changing the date of April primary elections to August. Effective date: Statute Bk.
Title
Elections: Changing the date of April primary elections to August. Effective date: Statute Bk.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Died in committee | |
2010-02-10 | Hearing: Mon., 2/15/2010, 3:30 PM, Rm 144-S | |
2010-02-05 | Referred to Elections -HJ 881 | |
2010-02-04 | Introduced -HJ 872 |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/legsrv-billtrack/searchBills.do |