KS H2328 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died on General Orders in House
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died on General Orders in House
Summary
Sales tax exemption for certain purchases of school supplies, computers and clothing and exemption for Kansas wildscape foundation, inc. Effective date: Statute Bk.
Title
Sales tax exemption for certain purchases of school supplies, computers and clothing and exemption for Kansas wildscape foundation, inc. Effective date: Statute Bk.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Died on General Orders in House | |
2009-03-24 | COW: -HJ 406; CR be adptd -HJ 406; Be am. -HJ 406; Motion to recommend for passage, failed -HJ 406 | |
2009-03-20 | CR: Be passed as am. by Taxation -HJ 363 | |
2009-02-25 | Hearing: Tues., 3/3/09, 9:00AM, Rm 535-N | |
2009-02-12 | Referred to Taxation -HJ 152 | |
2009-02-11 | Introduced -HJ 148 |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/legsrv-billtrack/searchBills.do |