IN SR0050 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on March 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-14 - Senators Breaux, Lanane, Melton, Mrvan, Tallian, Taylor G added as coauthors
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on March 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-14 - Senators Breaux, Lanane, Melton, Mrvan, Tallian, Taylor G added as coauthors
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
A SENATE RESOLUTION recognizing "Farmworkers Awareness Week", the birthday of Cesar Chavez, and the work of Proteus, Inc.
Title
A SENATE RESOLUTION recognizing "Farmworkers Awareness Week", the birthday of Cesar Chavez, and the work of Proteus, Inc.
Sponsors
Sen. David Niezgodski [D] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] | Sen. Mike Bohacek [R] | Sen. Jean Breaux [D] |
Sen. Timothy Lanane [D] | Sen. Eddie Melton [D] | Sen. Frank Mrvan [D] | Sen. Karen Tallian [D] |
Sen. Greg Taylor [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-12 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-14 | Senate | Senators Breaux, Lanane, Melton, Mrvan, Tallian, Taylor G added as coauthors |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Senator Bohacek added as coauthor |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Second reading: adopted voice vote |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 68(b); reassigned to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedure |
2018-03-06 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Pensions and Labor |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Niezgodski |