IN SR0039 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-06 - Second reading: adopted voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-06 - Second reading: adopted voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
A SENATE RESOLUTION urging the Indiana federal congressional delegation to support efforts to modify the United States Bankruptcy Code venue requirements.
Title
A SENATE RESOLUTION urging the Indiana federal congressional delegation to support efforts to modify the United States Bankruptcy Code venue requirements.
Sponsors
Sen. Rodric Bray [R] | Sen. Eric Koch [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | Senate | Second reading: adopted voice vote |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senator Koch added as second author |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2018-02-22 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Authored by Senator Bray |