IN SR0022 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-27 - Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A SENATE RESOLUTION urging INDOT to rename part of U.S. 20 for late Mayor Rudolph "Rudy" Clay.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A SENATE RESOLUTION urging INDOT to rename part of U.S. 20 for late Mayor Rudolph "Rudy" Clay.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2014-02-27SenateWithdrawn
2014-02-18SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted.
2014-02-03SenateFirst Reading: Referred to Homeland Security, Transportation, and Veterans Affairs
2014-01-30SenateAuthored by Senator Rogers.

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback