IN SCR0039 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 39-13)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-12 - Senator Zakas added as coauthor.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION congratulating and honoring Nick Goepper, the bronze medalist in men's slopestyle skiing at the 2014 Winter Olympics in Sochi Russia

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION congratulating and honoring Nick Goepper, the bronze medalist in men's slopestyle skiing at the 2014 Winter Olympics in Sochi Russia

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-12SenateSenator Zakas added as coauthor.
2014-03-12SenateSenator R. Young added as coauthor.
2014-03-12SenateSenator M. Young added as coauthor.
2014-03-12SenateSenator Yoder added as coauthor.
2014-03-12SenateSenator Wyss added as coauthor.
2014-03-12SenateSenator Waterman added as coauthor.
2014-03-12SenateSenator Waltz added as coauthor.
2014-03-12SenateSenator Walker added as coauthor.
2014-03-12SenateSenator Tomes added as coauthor.
2014-03-12SenateSenator Taylor added as coauthor.
2014-03-12SenateSenator Tallian added as coauthor.
2014-03-12SenateSenator Stoops added as coauthor.
2014-03-12SenateSenator Steele added as coauthor.
2014-03-12SenateSenator Smith added as coauthor.
2014-03-12SenateSenator Skinner added as coauthor.
2014-03-12SenateSenator Schneider added as coauthor.
2014-03-12SenateSenator Rogers added as coauthor.
2014-03-12SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor.
2014-03-12SenateSenator Paul added as coauthor.
2014-03-12SenateSenator Mrvan added as coauthor.
2014-03-12SenateSenator Mishler added as coauthor.
2014-03-12SenateSenator Pat Miller added as coauthor.
2014-03-12SenateSenator Pete Miller added as coauthor.
2014-03-12SenateSenator Merritt added as coauthor.
2014-03-12SenateSenator Long added as coauthor.
2014-03-12SenateSenator Leising added as coauthor.
2014-03-12SenateSenator Landske added as coauthor.
2014-03-12SenateSenator Lanane added as coauthor.
2014-03-12SenateSenator Kruse added as coauthor.
2014-03-12SenateSenator Kenley added as coauthor.
2014-03-12SenateSenator Hume added as coauthor.
2014-03-12SenateSenator Holdman added as coauthor.
2014-03-12SenateSenator Hershman added as coauthor.
2014-03-12SenateSenator Head added as coauthor.
2014-03-12SenateSenator Grooms added as coauthor.
2014-03-12SenateSenator Glick added as coauthor.
2014-03-12SenateSenator Eckerty added as coauthor.
2014-03-12SenateSenator Delph added as coauthor.
2014-03-12SenateSenator Crider added as coauthor.
2014-03-12SenateSenator Charbonneau added as coauthor.
2014-03-12SenateSenator Buck added as coauthor.
2014-03-12SenateSenator Broden added as coauthor.
2014-03-12SenateSenator Breaux added as coauthor.
2014-03-12SenateSenator Bray added as coauthor.
2014-03-12SenateSenator Boots added as coauthor.
2014-03-12SenateSenator Becker added as coauthor.
2014-03-12SenateSenator Banks added as coauthor.
2014-03-12SenateSenator Arnold added as coauthor.
2014-03-12SenateSenator Alting added as coauthor.
2014-03-11HouseFirst reading: adopted voice vote
2014-03-10SenateRepresentative Frye added as cosponsor.
2014-03-10SenateRepresentative McMillin added first sponsor.
2014-03-10SenateFirst reading: adopted voice vote
2014-03-06SenateAuthored by Senator Nugent.

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback