IN SCR0021 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-15 - Returned to the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-15 - Returned to the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION congratulating the Gary West Side Cougars boys varsity basketball team on being sectional and regional champions.
Title
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION congratulating the Gary West Side Cougars boys varsity basketball team on being sectional and regional champions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-15 | House | Returned to the Senate |
2021-04-14 | House | First reading: adopted voice vote |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2021-04-08 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Smith V |
2021-04-08 | Senate | First reading: adopted voice vote |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Authored by Senators Melton and Randolph Lonnie M |
Indiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/resolutions/senate/concurrent/21/details |
Text | http://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/f/0/7/5f07111a/SC0021.01.INTR.pdf |