IN SCR0016 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 42-10)
Status: Passed on March 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-13 - Representative Jordan added as cosponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 42-10)
Status: Passed on March 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-13 - Representative Jordan added as cosponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizing the National FFA Organization and the Indiana FFA Association. A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION recognizing the National FFA Organization and the Indiana FFA Association for exemplary work in the advancement of agricultural education in Indiana and across the country.
Title
Recognizing the National FFA Organization and the Indiana FFA Association.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-13 | House | Representative Jordan added as cosponsor |
2023-03-09 | House | Returned to the Senate |
2023-03-09 | House | First reading: adopted voice vote |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Senators Alexander, Alting, Baldwin, Bassler, Becker, Bohacek, Bray, Breaux, Brown L, Buchanan, Buck, Busch, Byrne, Charbonneau, Crane, Crider, Deery, Dernulc, Donato, Doriot, Ford J.D., Ford Jon, Freeman, Garten, Gaskill, Glick, Holdman, Hunley, Johnson, Koch, Melton, Messmer, Mishler, Niemeyer, Niezgodski, Perfect, Pol, Qaddoura, Raatz, Randolph, Rogers, Sandlin, Taylor G, Tomes, Walker G, Walker K, Yoder, Young M, Zay added as coauthors |
2023-02-21 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Aylesworth |
2023-02-21 | Senate | First reading: adopted voice vote |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Authored by Senator Leising |
Subjects
Indiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://iga.in.gov/legislative/2023/resolutions/senate/concurrent/16 |
Text | https://iga.in.gov/legislative/2023/resolutions/senate/concurrent/16#1.INTR |